Ìý
Committee members
The following members serve on the ASFC Local Governing Body:
-
Lawrence Ado-Kofie (Parent Governor)
-
Rick Allanson (Staff Governor)
-
Colin Challenger (Trustee - Chair)
-
John Clark (Academy Governor)
-
Mitesh Mistry (Academy Governor)
-
Jane O'Connell (Academy Governor)
-
Doug Pepper (Academy Governor)
-
Kamlesh Rajput (Academy Governor)
-
Tamoor Shafique (Academy Governor)
-
Janet Valentine (Staff Governor)
-
Philip Wilson-Marks (Academy Governor)
-
Student Council President (16-18 Student Governor)
Ìý
Attendance 2023/24
Ìý | Possible | Actual | % |
---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Ado-Kofie | 5 | 3 | 60 |
Rick Allanson | 5 | 4 | 80 |
Colin Challenger | 5 | 3 | 60 |
John Clark | 5 | 4 | 80 |
Chris Lyness | 5 | 5 | 100 |
Mitesh Mistry | 5 | 4 | 80 |
Jane O'Connell | 5 | 4 | 80 |
Doug Pepper | 5 | 2 | 40 |
Kamlesh Rajput | 5 | 3 | 60 |
Janet Valentine | 5 | 3 | 60 |
Ìý
Governors terms of office
Name | Date of Appointment | Term of Office | Date they stepped down (if applicable) | Appointed by | Date first appointed |
Colin Challenger | 01/02/2023 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | 01/02/2019 |
Louise Hall | 01/02/2019 | 4 years | 31/01/2023 | Trust Board | Ìý |
Kamlesh Rajput | 01/02/2023 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | 01/02/2019 |
Richard Allanson | 01/02/2023 | 4 years | Ìý | ASFC Teaching Staff | 01/02/2019 |
Chris Lyness | 01/02/2023 | 4 years | Ìý31/07/2024 | Trust Board | 01/02/2019 |
Amanda Read | 23/10/2019 | 4 years | 05/07/2023 | Trust Board | Ìý |
Jane O'Connell | 31/03/2021 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | Ìý |
Doug Pepper | 01/10/2021 | 4 years | Ìý | Elected (Parents) | Ìý |
Lawrence Ado-Kofie | 01/10/2021 | 4 years | Ìý | Elected (Parents) | Ìý |
Janet Valentine | 11/01/2021 | 4 years | Ìý | ASFC Support Staff | Ìý |
John Clark | 25/05/2022 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | Ìý |
Mitesh Mistry | 05/07/2023 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | Ìý |
Philip Wilson-Marks | 03/07/2024 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | Ìý |
Tamoor Shafique | 03/07/2024 | 4 years | Ìý | Trust Board | Ìý |